Global Patent Index - EP 0967330 A3

EP 0967330 A3 2000-05-03 - Tractionbar used as chord for a bridge

Title (en)

Tractionbar used as chord for a bridge

Title (de)

Zugstab zur Verwendung als Gurt für Brücken

Title (fr)

Bar de traction pour membrure de pont

Publication

EP 0967330 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99109576 A

Priority

DE 19828835 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19828835C1] The tie rod structure has an adhesive bonded shaft zone (18). with a rectangular cross section for the compound fiber (6) and metal material (10) sections, at the shaft zone, with an identical cross section run. The rod section (18) is longer than the thickness of the tie rod by 50:1, at the rod section, and the rod structure for the compound fiber and metal sections has a cutting edge shape at the thin sides. Two or more separate belts are bonded together to form double or multiple belts, using a heat setting adhesive on a woven carrier material at min. 120 deg C. The compound fiber section is mostly of carbon fibers with a longitudinal orientation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01D 1/00; E01D 15/12; E01D 101/30; E01D 101/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01D 1/00 (2006.01); E04C 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/085 (2013.01); E01D 1/00 (2013.01); E01D 2101/30 (2013.01); E01D 2101/40 (2013.01); Y10T 403/7045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19828835 C1 19990729; EP 0967330 A2 19991229; EP 0967330 A3 20000503; EP 0967330 B1 20040107; US 6374445 B1 20020423

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130514

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130514

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120601

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090514

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080524

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-01-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-11-01 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-05-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060515

2005-05-12 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050512

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-09-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-04-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-02-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT SE

2004-01-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TENSION BAR FOR USE AS A CHORD FOR BRIDGES

2003-10-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-10-01 [D18W] WITHDRAWAL (DELETED)

2003-09-10 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030705

2003-09-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT SE

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000925

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI