Global Patent Index - EP 0967341 A3

EP 0967341 A3 2000-11-15 - Mullion and transom connection

Title (en)

Mullion and transom connection

Title (de)

Pfosten-Riegel-Verbindung

Title (fr)

Connection montant et entretoise

Publication

EP 0967341 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99111934 A

Priority

DE 19828189 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0967341A2] A method for constructing steel frames for buildings has coupling blocks (8) secured to the sides of the uprights (2) by screw fasteners. Corresponding coupling blocks (18) with an open profile are secured into the open ends of the cross frames (4) and are clamped in position by grub screws (24) accessed via slide slots (16) in the cross frames. The side frames are slid laterally into position via the side slots and with the blocks locating over each other. Clamping wedges complete the fitting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/96

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/96 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/965 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0967341 A2 19991229; EP 0967341 A3 20001115; DE 19828189 C1 20011122

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-09-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI