Global Patent Index - EP 0967342 A3

EP 0967342 A3 2000-11-15 - Façade profile

Title (en)

Façade profile

Title (de)

Fassadenprofil

Title (fr)

Profil pour façades

Publication

EP 0967342 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99111953 A

Priority

DE 19828188 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0967342A2] A profile beam for constructing large facades for buildings has a simple cross sectional profile (2) e.g. a rectangle. Bolts (6) are fitted to the edges of the profile to secure profiled frames (4) which secure the cross members of the facade as well as providing support for the sealing strips for windows and building panels. Each bolt has a groove and a pointed outer end. A securing spring tag (8) clipped into a recess in the profiled strip has a hole which is pushed over the pointed bolt to be retained by a groove around the bolt. The bolts are either welded to the profile beam or are secured in threaded holes in the beam.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/96

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/96 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/965 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0967342 A2 19991229; EP 0967342 A3 20001115; DE 19828188 C1 20000309

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040422

2003-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: JOSEF GARTNER GMBH

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010322

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI