Global Patent Index - EP 0967343 A3

EP 0967343 A3 2001-04-18 - Sandwich elements for the building of walls or roofs

Title (en)

Sandwich elements for the building of walls or roofs

Title (de)

Sandwichelemente zum Erstellen von Wänden und Dächern

Title (fr)

Eléments sandwich pour la construction de murs ou de toitures

Publication

EP 0967343 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108847 A

Priority

DE 19824597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0967343A2] A lightweight, thermally insulated building panel has a rigid foam inner block (2) sandwiched between an outer corrugated steel shell (4) and an inner flat steel shell (5). The outer edges of the panels have sealing profiles which interlock between adjoining panels to form a weatherproof seal. The joint has three sealing faces and has integral drainage channels which duct away moisture e.g. when used for roofing. The corrugations are formed by alternate radii linked by common tangents (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 7/22; E04C 2/292; E04D 3/35; E04D 3/36; E04D 3/361

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 7/22 (2006.01); E04C 2/292 (2006.01); E04D 3/35 (2006.01); E04D 3/36 (2006.01); E04D 3/38 (2006.01); E04F 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 3/38 (2013.01); E04C 2/292 (2013.01); E04D 3/352 (2013.01); E04D 3/355 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0967343 A2 19991229; EP 0967343 A3 20010418; CZ 9901948 A3 19991215; DE 19824597 C1 20000224; HR P990155 A2 20000430; HR P990155 B1 20020430; PL 333167 A1 19991206; SK 72499 A3 20000214

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031219

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP STAHL AG

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-01-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20011018;SI PAYMENT 20011018

2001-06-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010320

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04B 7/22 A, 7E 04D 3/35 B, 7E 04C 2/292 B, 7E 04D 3/36 B, 7E 04D 3/361 B

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI