Global Patent Index - EP 0967349 A3

EP 0967349 A3 2002-11-20 - Locking device for a movable element, in particular a vehicle door

Title (en)

Locking device for a movable element, in particular a vehicle door

Title (de)

Schliesseinrichtung für ein bewegliches Element, insbesondere für eine Tür eines Fahrzeuges

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fermeture pour un élément mobile, notamment une porte d'un véhicule

Publication

EP 0967349 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99110839 A

Priority

DE 19828202 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0967349A2] The locking device includes a rotating trap (1) which locks or releases a locking bolt, and a pawl (4) which locks the rotating trap in position. The pawl is driven by a positioning drive (10) to release the rotating trap in an aperture position of the element. Devices control the positioning drive in such way, that it is led back from an operating position into a rest position after a release of the rotating trap. The positioning drive is controlled by pulse width modulation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 17/22; E05B 47/00; E05B 65/12; E05B 65/19; E05B 65/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 77/26 (2014.01); E05B 81/24 (2014.01); E05B 81/60 (2014.01); E05B 81/76 (2014.01); E05B 17/22 (2006.01); E05B 79/12 (2014.01); E05B 85/24 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/25 (2013.01); E05B 77/26 (2013.01); E05B 81/60 (2013.01); E05B 81/76 (2013.01); E05B 79/12 (2013.01); E05B 85/243 (2013.01); Y10T 70/7113 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1047 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0967349 A2 19991229; EP 0967349 A3 20021120; BR 9903280 A 20000418; DE 19828202 A1 19991230; JP 2000027510 A 20000125; US 6279972 B1 20010828

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040615

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030526

2003-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05B 17/22 A, 7E 05B 47/00 B, 7E 05B 65/32 B, 7E 05B 65/19 B, 7E 05B 65/12 B

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI