Global Patent Index - EP 0967356 A3

EP 0967356 A3 2001-04-18 - Closure device for an opening of a building

Title (en)

Closure device for an opening of a building

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verschliessen einer Gebäudeöffnung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fermeture pour une ouverture d'un bâtiment

Publication

EP 0967356 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99111690 A

Priority

DE 29811151 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0967356A2] The window or door opening has a frame and casement frame made from profiled sections cut to length and joined at the corners. A front structure (5) with insulation means (9) is mounted in front of the casement (2). The window frame (1) has a projection (6) extending beyond the front edge of the casement (2) and the front structural unit (7) is mounted on the projection extending at least in part over the casement. The front structure can be in one or several pieces. Reinforcements (10) are mounted in same.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/34 (2006.01); E06B 3/22 (2006.01); E06B 3/30 (2006.01); E06B 7/14 (2006.01); E06B 7/23 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/308 (2013.01); E06B 1/345 (2013.01); E06B 3/222 (2013.01); E06B 3/306 (2013.01); E06B 7/14 (2013.01); E06B 7/2309 (2013.01); E06B 3/221 (2013.01); E06B 3/223 (2013.01); E06B 2003/226 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29811151 U1 19980827; EP 0967356 A2 19991229; EP 0967356 A3 20010418

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070102

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PROFINE GMBH

2002-01-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB LI LU NL SE

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB LI LU NL

2002-01-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20010926;LV PAYMENT 20010926;RO PAYMENT 20010926;SI PAYMENT 20010926

2001-12-12 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20010926

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011004

2001-05-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOEMMERLING KUNSTSTOFF GMBH

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB LI LU NL SE

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI