Global Patent Index - EP 0967358 A3

EP 0967358 A3 2000-10-25 - Assembly arrangement between a hollow mullion and a plastic or light metal door or window frame

Title (en)

Assembly arrangement between a hollow mullion and a plastic or light metal door or window frame

Title (de)

Anordnung zum Befestigen eines einen Hohlquerschnitt aufweisenden Pfostens am Blendrahmen eines Fensters oder einer Türe aus Kunststoff oder Leichtmetall

Title (fr)

Assemblage entre un meneau creux et le dormant d'une porte ou fenêtre en matière plastique ou métal léger

Publication

EP 0967358 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99111239 A

Priority

DE 19828382 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0967358A2] The post (5) and the arch frame (1) have at least one rib (8,10,11) forming a stop for a pane of glass or similar. The insert section (3) extends from a baseplate (4) locating in a holding groove of the arch frame. On one of the sides of the insert section a longitudinal groove (17) is formed, extending over its length. In the one side of the arch frame opposite to the holding groove, fixture screws (19) with threaded shafts extend through it and the baseplate of the post connector (2) and with their threads (22) cut into the base of the longitudinal groove and also into the wall of the hollow cross-section of the post covering over the open side of the longitudinal groove. The post connector and the post are fixed in relation to each other and at the same time the post connector is tensioned against the arch frame.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/964; E06B 3/96

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/96 (2006.01); E06B 3/964 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/9624 (2013.01); E06B 3/9636 (2013.01); E06B 3/9642 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0967358 A2 19991229; EP 0967358 A3 20001025; DE 19828382 A1 20000113; DE 19828382 C2 20030327; HR P990170 A2 20000430; HU 9902197 A2 20000428; HU 9902197 A3 20001030; HU 9902197 D0 19990830

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-03-19 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20021028

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2001-07-18 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19990609;SI PAYMENT 19990609

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001201

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 19990609;SI PAYMENT 19990609

2000-10-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 06B 3/964 A, 7E 06B 3/96 B

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 19990609;SI PAYMENT 19990609