Global Patent Index - EP 0967389 A3

EP 0967389 A3 2001-05-30 - Injection indication apparatus

Title (en)

Injection indication apparatus

Title (de)

Anzeigeeinrichtung für die Einspritzung

Title (fr)

Appareil d'indication d'injection

Publication

EP 0967389 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99301600 A

Priority

GB 9806567 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0967389A2] Apparatus for indicating an operating characteristic of an injector (72) or an injection system especially for an internal combustion engine., The apparatus is provided with a body (10) formed with a cavity (12) into which fluid is injected when the apparatus is in use, and a pressure transducer (56) coupled with the cavity (12) to provide an indication of the pressure therewithin. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 65/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 65/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 65/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] GB 2115884 A 19830914 - HARTRIDGE LTD LESLIE

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0967389 A2 19991229; EP 0967389 A3 20010530; GB 9806567 D0 19980527

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041001

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011015

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI