Global patent index - EP 0967393 A3

EP 0967393 A3 2000-01-05 - Liquid ring compressor

Title (en)

Liquid ring compressor

Title (de)

Flüssigkeitsringkompressor

Title (fr)

Compresseur à anneau liquide

Publication

EP 0967393 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99810364 A

Priority

  • EP 99810364 A
  • EP 98810598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0967393A2] The outlet (15,19) of the first stage has a separate gas outlet channel and a separate fluid outlet channel, so arranged and formed that fluid coming from the first stage is fed into the fluid outlet channel and the gas coming from the first stage is fed into the gas outlet channel. A dividing wall (18) separates the fluid and gas outlet channels.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 19/004 (2013.01); F04C 19/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0967393 A2 19991229; EP 0967393 A3 20000105; EP 0967393 B1 20050330

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20111230

2011-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110430

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59911821

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100420

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100423

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100424

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100506

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060102

2005-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59911821

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20050504

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-04-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050330

2005-03-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-03-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: NSB GAS PROCESSING AG

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: BURCKHARDT COMPRESSION AG

2001-11-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: MASCHINENFABRIK SULZER-BURCKHARDT AG

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI