Global patent index - EP 0967399 A3

EP 0967399 A3 2000-04-26 - Multiple-stage double-acting hydraulic cylinder with hydraulic circuit, especially for elevating

Title (en)

Multiple-stage double-acting hydraulic cylinder with hydraulic circuit, especially for elevating

Title (de)

Mehrstufiger, doppelt wirkender Hydraulikzylinder mit Hydraulikanordnung insbesondere für Hubarbeitssysteme

Title (fr)

Vérin hydraulique à plusieurs étages et à double effet avec circuit hydraulique, surtout pour élévateurs

Publication

EP 0967399 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99112185 A

Priority

DE 29811413 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0967399A2] The cylinder has an outer housing and at least two piston rods located one within the other. Annular chambers (18) between the first rod and the housing and between the two pistons respectively. The annular chambers are connected fluidly via bores (24) located in the piston rods, whereby the bores cross over a piston to form a connection between the outer and inner chamber. A stop valve (66) is provided in the connection with an auxiliary tank (68) through which the return of hydraulic fluid from the cylinder to the tank can be controlled.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/70 (2006.01); B66F 11/04 (2006.01); F15B 11/024 (2006.01); F15B 15/16 (2006.01); F15B 15/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/024 (2013.01); B66C 23/705 (2013.01); B66F 11/046 (2013.01); F15B 15/16 (2013.01); F15B 15/2807 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29811413 U1 19990826; EP 0967399 A2 19991229; EP 0967399 A3 20000426

INPADOC legal status

2001-11-14 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20010920

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI SE

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI SE

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI