Global Patent Index - EP 0967438 A3

EP 0967438 A3 2000-03-08 - Device for feeding a burner with "Refuse Derived Fuels" (RDF)

Title (en)

Device for feeding a burner with "Refuse Derived Fuels" (RDF)

Title (de)

Zufuhrvorrichtung für Brenner mit Abfallbrennstoffen (RDF)

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'alimentation de brûleurs à combustibles provenant de déchets (RDF)

Publication

EP 0967438 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99110218 A

Priority

IT MI981421 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0967438A2] Device for feeding a burner with a low bulk density, unconventional and compressible solid fuel which includes: an entrance chamber (1) with a feeding hopper (5), an advancing chamber (2) for the forward moving of the fuel, consisting of a cylindrical pipe having inside at least one rotating screw (6), moved by an outer rotative engine; a pressing chamber (3) where inside the solid fuel is pressed by the screw (6); and a cutting device (4) put at exit of the chamber (6), connected to the rotating screw and bearing at least two self-sharping blades (9). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23G 5/44; F23G 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/444 (2013.01); F23G 2201/80 (2013.01); F23G 2205/121 (2013.01); F23G 2205/20 (2013.01); F23G 2900/50209 (2013.01); F23G 2900/50212 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0967438 A2 19991229; EP 0967438 A3 20000308; EP 0967438 B1 20040414; AT 264482 T 20040415; DE 69916370 D1 20040519; ES 2217646 T3 20041101; IT 1301772 B1 20000707; IT MI981421 A1 19991222; PT 967438 E 20040831

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160530

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160705

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160626

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160629

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160629

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: A2A AMBIENTE S.P.A., IT

- Document: AT 264482 T

- Effective date: 20150608

2015-07-01 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20150623

2015-07-01 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20150623

2015-03-02 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: A2A AMBIENTE S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20150224

2014-11-21 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20141021

2014-11-21 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: A2A AMBIENTE S..P.A, IT

- Effective date: 20141021

2014-11-21 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Effective date: 20141021

2011-09-30 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ECODECO S.R.L.., IT

- Effective date: 20110829

2011-09-19 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: ECODECO S.R.L.

- Effective date: 20110906

2011-06-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110526 AND 20110601

2011-05-18 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110502

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050117

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2217646 T3

2004-10-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-08-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040607

2004-07-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040402093

2004-07-15 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040715

2004-07-14 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-07-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-07-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: SISTEMA ECODECO S.P.A.

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69916370 P 20040519

2004-05-12 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SISTEMA ECODECO S.P.A.

2004-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2004-04-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-04-14 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-14 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NATTA, GIUSEPPE

2004-04-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROMANONI, ITALO

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021120

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000704

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI