Global Patent Index - EP 0967452 A3

EP 0967452 A3 2000-11-15 - Cleaning apparatus for heat exchanger conduits

Title (en)

Cleaning apparatus for heat exchanger conduits

Title (de)

Reinigungseinrichtung für Wärmetauscherzüge

Title (fr)

Installation de néttoyage pour conduits d'échangeur de chaleur

Publication

EP 0967452 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98890221 A

Priority

AT 111098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0967452A2] A single cleaning component (105) is successively pushed into the flue gas ducts (106) and is movable via an adjustment mechanism (101, 118) crossways to the longitudinal direction of the flue gas ducts. The adjustment mechanism has a guide (104) for the cleaning component, which is positionable in an axial direction in front of the flue gas ducts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28G 1/02; F23J 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23J 3/02 (2006.01); F28G 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23J 3/02 (2013.01); F28G 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0967452 A2 19991229; EP 0967452 A3 20001115; AT 405973 B 20000125; AT A111098 A 19990515

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030201

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FI IT LI SE

2001-08-01 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20010514

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010514

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI IT LI SE

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI