Global Patent Index - EP 0967528 A3

EP 0967528 A3 2001-01-31 - Developing device

Title (en)

Developing device

Title (de)

Entwicklungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de développement

Publication

EP 0967528 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99111926 A

Priority

JP 17426098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0967528A2] A developing device for developing an electrostatic latent image on a photoconductive member has a developing roller that bears a one-component developer on its surface and develops the electrostatic latent image by contacting the photoconductive member; a supply roller for supplying developer to the developing roller; and a blade that contacts the developing roller so as to regulate a layer thickness of the developer supplied by the supply roller, wherein supposing that the developer has a volume-average particle size represented by Dbk, the developer at this time being maintained on the developing roller as a layer that has been supplied by the supply roller and again formed so as to have a predetermined thickness by the blade after the developing roller, on which the developer was formed as a layer having a predetermined thickness, carried out a black-image developing process, and supposing that the volume-average particle size of the developer is Dwt, the developer at this time being maintained on the developing roller as a layer that has been supplied by the supply roller and again formed so as to have a predetermined thickness by the blade after the developing roller, on which the developer was formed as a layer having a predetermined thickness, carried out a white-image developing process, an inequality, Dwt/Dbk > 0.8, is satisfied. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 13/08; G03G 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 9/08 (2006.01); G03G 13/08 (2006.01); G03G 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 13/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0967528 A2 19991229; EP 0967528 A3 20010131; EP 0967528 B1 20030903; CN 1120388 C 20030903; CN 1246663 A 20000308; DE 69910907 D1 20031009; DE 69910907 T2 20040722; JP 2000010404 A 20000114

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140622

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-03-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150227

2015-03-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69910907

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140622

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69910907

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130624

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130619

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130619

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-04-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69910907

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020612

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010503

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 03G 13/08 A, 7G 03G 15/08 B

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI