Global Patent Index - EP 0967690 A3

EP 0967690 A3 2001-01-10 - Method for connecting a thin wire with a current conducting contact element and products of this process

Title (en)

Method for connecting a thin wire with a current conducting contact element and products of this process

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Verbinden eines dünnen Drahtes mit einem stromleitenden Kontaktelement und Produkte dieses Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé de raccordement de fils mince avec un élément de contact conduisant de courant et produits ainsi obtenus

Publication

EP 0967690 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99110309 A

Priority

DE 19828110 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0967690A2] The wire end (2) is mechanically fixed at the end (7) of the terminal (3) and is under light tension. A current-conducting connection (e.g. soldered joint, weld) is then completed. The terminal is then forced axially into the casing (6), relaxing the tension on the wire. An Independent claim is included for components employing the connecting method. These are a coil, choke and transformer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/58; H01F 5/04; H01F 41/10; H01R 4/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/58 (2006.01); H01R 43/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/58 (2013.01); H01R 43/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0967690 A2 19991229; EP 0967690 A3 20010110; EP 0967690 B1 20030129; AT 232025 T 20030215; DE 19828110 A1 20000113; ES 2189314 T3 20030701

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060529

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060527

2007-01-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060529

2006-05-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060528

2006-05-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060527

2006-05-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060527

2005-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050531

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050527

2005-05-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050527

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050516

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-12 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050512

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050511

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050510

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-08-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2189314 T3

2003-06-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030520

2003-05-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904137 P 20030306

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-01-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010724

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010305

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/58 A, 7H 01R 4/02 B, 7H 01F 41/10 B, 7H 01F 5/04 B

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI