Global patent index - EP 0967694 A3

EP 0967694 A3 2000-06-28 - Automotive cellular phone connector assembly

Title (en)

Automotive cellular phone connector assembly

Title (de)

Steckverbinderzusammenbau für Mobiltelefon im Fahrzeugen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de connection pour un téléphone cellulaire

Publication

EP 0967694 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99303913 A

Priority

US 8732698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0967694A2] An electrical connector assembly (20) for use in connecting portable electronic devices, such a cellular telephones, to the electrical system of a motor vehicle. The electrical connector assembly (20) includes a plug connector (30) that can be attached to a cord for connection to the portable electronic device. A mating receptacle connector (60) is permanently mounted in the motor vehicle and is attached to an automotive wiring harness. The receptacle connector (60) includes a terminal position assurance member (110) that forms a front cover of the receptacle connector (60) when properly positioned. Primary terminal latches securing receptacle terminals (62) in a housing (74) of the receptacle connector (60) are exposed on the top and bottom surfaces of the housing (74) and prevent full seating of the assurance member (110) on the housing (74) when any receptacle terminals are not correctly latched into the housing (74). Terminals (62) can therefore be positioned on the relatively close centerlines characteristic of electrical connectors used with portable electronic devices. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 27/02; H01R 13/436

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/436 (2006.01); H01R 27/02 (2006.01); H01R 13/422 (2006.01); H01R 13/658 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 27/02 (2013.01); H01R 13/4365 (2013.01); H01R 13/4223 (2013.01); H01R 13/6596 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0967694 A2 19991229; EP 0967694 A3 20000628

INPADOC legal status

2005-09-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050312

2004-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040901

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001215

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 27/02 A, 7H 01R 13/436 B

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI