Global Patent Index - EP 0967878 A4

EP 0967878 A4 2002-11-27 - TARGETED CYTOTOXIC CELLS

Title (en)

TARGETED CYTOTOXIC CELLS

Title (de)

GEZIELTE CYTOTOXISCHE ZELLEN

Title (fr)

CELLULES CYTOTOXIQUES CIBLEES

Publication

EP 0967878 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97947273 A

Priority

  • US 9719206 W
  • US 74000396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9817116A1] Disclosed are mammalian cells that express and secrete immunotoxins directed against tumors, HIV antigens and other diseased cells. Preferred cells include lymphocytes and neurons.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 63/00; A61K 38/00; A61K 38/16; A61K 39/00; A61K 39/395; A61K 48/00; C07K 14/00; C07K 16/46; C07K 19/00; C12N 5/00; C12N 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 35/14 (2006.01); A61K 35/30 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 31/18 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/10 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C07K 16/32 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/32 (2013.01); C07K 16/1063 (2013.01); C07K 16/2833 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] WO 9522618 A1 19950824 - DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US], et al
  • [Y] VITETTA E S ET AL: "Immunotoxins: magic bullets or misguided missiles ?", IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, vol. 14, no. 6, June 1993 (1993-06-01), pages 252 - 259, XP002130421, ISSN: 0167-5699
  • [DY] CHEN S-Y ET AL: "DESIGN OF A GENETIC IMMUNOTOXIN TO ELIMINATE TOXIN IMMUNOGENICITY", GENE THERAPY, MACMILLAN PRESS LTD., BASINGSTOKE, GB, vol. 2, no. 2, 1 March 1995 (1995-03-01), pages 116 - 123, XP000672862, ISSN: 0969-7128
  • [A] HEIMBROOK D C ET AL: "TRANSFORMING GROWTH FACTOR ALPHA PSEUDOMONAS EXOTOXIN FUSION PROTEIN PROLONGS SURVIVAL OF NUDE MICE BEARING TUMOR XENOGRAFTS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES, vol. 87, no. 12, 1990, 1990, pages 4697 - 4701, XP002215111, ISSN: 0027-8424
  • [PX] CHEN S Y ET AL: "Potent antitumour activity of a new class of tumour-specific killer cells.", NATURE. ENGLAND 2 JAN 1997, vol. 385, no. 6611, 2 January 1997 (1997-01-02), pages 78 - 80, XP001093757, ISSN: 0028-0836
  • [PX] YANG A G ET AL: "A new class of antigen-specific killer cells.", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY. UNITED STATES JAN 1997, vol. 15, no. 1, January 1997 (1997-01-01), pages 46 - 51, XP001093758, ISSN: 1087-0156
  • See also references of WO 9817116A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9817116 A1 19980430; AU 5239498 A 19980515; AU 738749 B2 20010927; CA 2269507 A1 19980430; CN 1244772 A 20000216; EP 0967878 A1 20000105; EP 0967878 A4 20021127; IL 129474 D0 20000229; JP 2001503978 A 20010327

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030424

2002-11-27 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021011

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990514

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE