Global patent index - EP 0967887 A1

EP 0967887 A1 2000-01-05 - STARCH WITH REDUCED AMYLOSE CONTENT

Title (en)

STARCH WITH REDUCED AMYLOSE CONTENT

Title (de)

STÄRKE MIT REDUZIERTEM AMYLOSEGEHALT

Title (fr)

AMIDON PRESENTANT UNE TENEUR LIMITEE EN AMYLOSE

Publication

EP 0967887 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98913008 A

Priority

  • GB 9705746 A
  • US 9805546 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9841112A1] Food products, particularly pourable food products or bakery products (such as various breads) which exhibit a reduced tendency to retrograde or stale, respectively, comprising starch having particular amylose properties.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A23L 1/0522; A23L 1/39; A21D 2/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A21D 2/18 (2006.01); A23D 7/005 (2006.01); A23K 1/18 (2006.01); A23L 1/05 (2006.01); A23L 1/0522 (2006.01); A23L 1/09 (2006.01); A23L 1/39 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A21D 2/186 (2013.01); A23D 7/0056 (2013.01); A23K 50/40 (2016.05); A23L 23/00 (2016.08); A23L 29/212 (2016.08); A23L 29/35 (2016.08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9841112 A1 19980924; AU 6766498 A 19981012; AU 6766598 A 19981012; AU 6766698 A 19981012; CA 2281868 A1 19980924; CN 1259020 A 20000705; EP 0967887 A1 20000105; GB 9705746 D0 19970507; JP 2001516224 A 20010925; WO 9841097 A2 19980924; WO 9841097 A3 19990107; WO 9841111 A1 19980924; ZA 9802346 B 19990920

INPADOC legal status

2006-10-27 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Country Code: HK

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1025484

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2002-06-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011221

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: LIMAGRAIN AGRO-INDUSTRIE SA

2000-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001010

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991020

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE