Global Patent Index - EP 0967903 A1

EP 0967903 A1 2000-01-05 - SUPPORT STRUCTURE FOR BED BASES

Title (en)

SUPPORT STRUCTURE FOR BED BASES

Title (de)

STÜTZSTRUKTURFÜR BETTUNTERTEIL

Title (fr)

STRUCTURE DE SUPPORT POUR BASES DE LIT

Publication

EP 0967903 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97940109 A

Priority

  • EP 9704571 W
  • IT UD970034 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9835591A1] A support structure for bed bases (11), comprising a plurality of elastic slats (1), bars or strips positioned transversely to the bed frame (12) and connected to it via slat-carrying rocker joints (6), and a plurality of hydraulic jacks (2) positioned at least in a central region of the bed base (11) and connecting the rocker joints (6) to the frame (12). The hydraulic jacks (2) are connected together longitudinally to form a hydraulic circuit (3) operating on the basis of communicating vessels. By utilizing the phenomenon of pressure equalization, the pistons (15, 30) of the jacks (2) react to the pressures exerted by the body distended on the bed base (11), to compensate the hollowing created by the heavier parts of the body, i.e. those situated between the shoulder and pelvis, with an upward thrust for supporting the lighter parts, i.e. the back and kidneys.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/02 (2006.01); A47C 23/06 (2006.01); A61G 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/065 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9835591A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9835591 A1 19980820; AU 4206697 A 19980908; CA 2279921 A1 19980820; DE 69706711 D1 20011018; DE 69706711 T2 20020704; EP 0967903 A1 20000105; EP 0967903 B1 20010912; ES 2164369 T3 20020216; IT 1290723 B1 19981210; IT UD970034 A1 19980817; JP 2001512335 A 20010821

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050810

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-30 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20070314

2008-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ESPERIDES S.R.L.

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060816

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060814

2007-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060816

2007-06-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060814

2007-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-10-18 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20061018

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-08-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060803

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-09-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050927

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050815

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050811

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050810

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050809

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BRISK B.V.

2002-08-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BRISK B.V.

- Effective date: 20020612

2002-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2164369 T3

2002-02-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN

2001-10-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69706711 20011018

2001-09-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-07-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-01-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990803

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL