Global Patent Index - EP 0967944 A1

EP 0967944 A1 2000-01-05 - DISPOSABLE THERMAL BODY PAD

Title (en)

DISPOSABLE THERMAL BODY PAD

Title (de)

THERMISCHE EINWEGKÖRPERKOMPRESSE

Title (fr)

PETITS COUSSINS CHAUFFANTS JETABLES POUR LE CORPS

Publication

EP 0967944 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97953304 A

Priority

  • US 9723402 W
  • US 77785696 A
  • US 98436797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9829063A1] The present invention relates to disposable thermal body pads comprising one or more thermal packs having a unified structure of at least one continuous layer of a semirigid material which softens when heated and a plurality of individual heat cells, spaced apart and fixed within or to the unified structure of the thermal pack. The disposable thermal body pads are intended to be attached to a user's clothing on one side and to be held directly against the user's skin on the other side. More particularly, the present invention relates to disposable thermal body pads having good conformity to user's body which provides consistent, convenient and comfortable heat application. Even more particularly, the present invention relates to such disposable thermal body pads intended for relieving menstrual pain.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 7/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 7/08 (2006.01); A61F 7/00 (2006.01); A61F 7/03 (2006.01); A61F 7/02 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

A61F (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 7/03 (2013.01); A61F 2007/0098 (2013.01); A61F 2007/0268 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9829063A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9829063 A1 19980709; AT 235202 T 20030415; AU 5707898 A 19980731; AU 738531 B2 20010920; BR 9714448 A 20001024; CA 2276479 A1 19980709; CA 2276479 C 20040316; CN 1149060 C 20040512; CN 1254268 A 20000524; DE 69720280 D1 20030430; DE 69720280 T2 20040205; DK 0967944 T3 20030714; EP 0967944 A1 20000105; EP 0967944 B1 20030326; ES 2193420 T3 20031101; HK 1024612 A1 20040116; HU 0002866 A2 20010129; JP 2001507593 A 20010612; JP 2007167681 A 20070705; JP 4607262 B2 20110105; JP 4612642 B2 20110112; NO 993243 A 19990825; NO 993243 D0 19990629; US 6019782 A 20000201

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20171218

2018-05-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180508

2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20171216

2018-01-10 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20171216

2017-12-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69720280

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161215

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161117

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-10-28 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20091001 AND 20091007

2009-10-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: THE *PROCTER & GAMBLE CY

- Effective date: 20041231

2005-09-21 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-08-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-07-25 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2005-07-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050704

2005-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: THE *PROCTER & GAMBLE CY

- Effective date: 20041231

2005-01-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050103

2004-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041218

2004-12-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041217

2004-12-17 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041217

2004-03-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031230

2004-01-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040114

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-19 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031219

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-17 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031202

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-10 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031110

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-06 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20031106

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-04 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031104

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2193420 T3

2003-10-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20031029

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-14 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20031014

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-16 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030402365

2003-07-14 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2003-06-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-06-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-04-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69720280 P 20030430

2003-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2003-03-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-03-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030326

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010528

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DAVIS, LEANE, KRISTINE

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CRAMER, RONALD, DEAN

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: OUELLETTE, WILLIAM, ROBERT

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KIMBLE, DAWN, MICHELE

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990701

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE