Global Patent Index - EP 0967965 A1

EP 0967965 A1 2000-01-05 - LOW FOAMING THERAPEUTIC TOOTHPASTES WITH IMPROVED CLEANING AND ABRASION PERFORMANCE

Title (en)

LOW FOAMING THERAPEUTIC TOOTHPASTES WITH IMPROVED CLEANING AND ABRASION PERFORMANCE

Title (de)

SCHWACHSCHÄUMENDE THERAPEUTISCHE ZAHNPASTA MIT VERBESSERTER PUTZ- UND ABRASIONSLEITUNGEN

Title (fr)

DENTIFRICES THERAPEUTIQUES A MOUSSAGE FAIBLE PRESENTANT DES QUALITES DE NETTOYAGE ET D'ABRASION AMELIOREES

Publication

EP 0967965 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97934943 A

Priority

  • US 9712208 W
  • US 2270596 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9804234A1] Low foaming therapeutic toothpastes containing a therapeutic substance, an abrasive, a humectant, a low foam surfactant, and/or a foam control agent having improved cleaning and abrasion performance wherein: packing of the abrasive into the channels of a channeled bristle toothbrush, and abrasive/tooth surface contact, are substantially free from surfactant bubble interference such that Cleaning Efficiency Coefficient and Abrasion Efficiency Coefficient values greater than about 1.1 are achieved along with improvement in therapeutic efficacy.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61Q 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/02 (2013.01); A61Q 11/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9804234 A1 19980205; AU 3799297 A 19980220; BR 9710528 A 19990817; CA 2260930 A1 19980205; EP 0967965 A1 20000105; EP 0967965 A4 20010124; JP 2000516216 A 20001205

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-02 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1023512

2004-08-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040203

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020131

2001-01-24 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001207

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990201

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE