Global Patent Index - EP 0967972 A1

EP 0967972 A1 2000-01-05 - EXTENDIBLE TRANSDERMAL THERAPEUTIC SYSTEM

Title (en)

EXTENDIBLE TRANSDERMAL THERAPEUTIC SYSTEM

Title (de)

DEHNBARES TRANSDERMALES THERAPEUTISCHES SYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME THERAPEUTIQUE TRANSDERMIQUE EXTENSIBLE

Publication

EP 0967972 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98908021 A

Priority

  • DE 19705138 A
  • EP 9800496 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19705138A1] The invention relates to a transdermal therapeutic system containing active ingredients, comprising a non-adhesive back layer, a reservoir layer containing active ingredients and a self-adhesive surface layer facing the skin, which possibly has a detachable protective layer. Said therapeutic system is characterized in that it has an elastic, or plastically extendible, diffusible back layer with a metal coating, in particular one made of vaporized metal, formed by layer growth, which serves as a permeable barrier for active ingredients and additives contained in the reservoir layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 9/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/70 (2006.01); A61K 31/4422 (2006.01); A61L 15/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/7053 (2013.01); A61K 9/7076 (2013.01); A61L 15/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9834600A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19705138 A1 19980813; AU 6617798 A 19980826; AU 725245 B2 20001012; CA 2279994 A1 19980813; EP 0967972 A1 20000105; JP 2001512428 A 20010821; KR 20000070798 A 20001125; NO 993855 A 19990810; NO 993855 D0 19990810; US 6277400 B1 20010821; WO 9834600 A1 19980813

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030104

2002-03-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HORSTMANN, MICHAEL

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010410

2000-02-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990730

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19990730