Global Patent Index - EP 0968005 A2

EP 0968005 A2 2000-01-05 - USE OF ISOTHIAZOLONE REDUCTION OF EMISSIONS OF HCN

Title (en)

USE OF ISOTHIAZOLONE REDUCTION OF EMISSIONS OF HCN

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON ISOTHIAZOLONE ZUR REDUZIERUNG VON EMISSIONEN VON HCN

Title (fr)

UTILISATION D'ISOTHIAZOLONE POUR LA REDUCTION DES EMISSIONS DE HCN

Publication

EP 0968005 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98900123 A

Priority

  • DE 19703711 A
  • IB 9800063 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19703711A1] This application relates to the use of isothiazolone compounds, mercapto compounds, cyclodextrin compounds, iodopropynyl butylcarbamate, diiodomethyl p-tolyl sulphone, zinc oxide, hydrogen peroxide or mixtures of two or more such compounds as additive for the reduction of emissions of volatile compounds which are potentially hazardous or cause unpleasant odour from compositions which comprise constituents which form such compounds which are potentially hazardous or cause unpleasant odour.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61L 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 275/02 (2006.01); A61L 9/01 (2006.01); A62D 3/30 (2007.01); C07D 275/04 (2006.01); C08B 37/16 (2006.01); C09K 3/00 (2006.01); A62D 101/26 (2007.01); A62D 101/28 (2007.01); A62D 101/45 (2007.01); A62D 101/47 (2007.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62D 3/30 (2013.01); A62D 2101/26 (2013.01); A62D 2101/28 (2013.01); A62D 2101/45 (2013.01); A62D 2101/47 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9832473A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19703711 A1 19980730; DE 19703711 C2 19990701; AU 5336598 A 19980818; BR 9807087 A 20000418; CA 2278288 A1 19980730; EP 0968005 A2 20000105; EP 0968005 B1 20050105; ES 2235309 T3 20050701; JP 2001521411 A 20011106; WO 9832473 A2 19980730; WO 9832473 A3 19980911

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110117

2012-02-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120220

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110116

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110116

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110116

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100121

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100223

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100130

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100125

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-01-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051006

2005-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2235309 T3

2005-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69828492 P 20050210

2005-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-01-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-07-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF ISOTHIAZOLONE REDUCTION OF EMISSIONS OF HCN

2004-06-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF ISOTHIAZOLONE REDUCTION OF EMISSIONS OF HCN

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030630

2002-09-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE SANTE (INTERNATIONAL)

2002-09-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHUELKE & MAYR GMBH

2002-09-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHUELKE & MAYR GMBH

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990823

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT