Global patent index - EP 0968015 A2

EP 0968015 A2 2000-01-05 - SYSTEM FOR REMOVING CLOTS FROM FLUID VESSELS

Title (en)

SYSTEM FOR REMOVING CLOTS FROM FLUID VESSELS

Title (de)

SYSTEM ZUM ENTFERNEN VON PFROPFEN AUS BLUTGEFÄSSEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME POUR EXTRAIRE DES CAILLOTS HORS DES VAISSEAUX SANGUINS

Publication

EP 0968015 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 97954908 A

Priority

  • US 9718793 W
  • US 75614596 A
  • US 81107697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9825656A2] Systems, methods and apparatus for removing arteriosclerotic plaque or clots, such as emboli and/or thrombi, from the interior of a fluid vessel, such as a cerebral or coronary artery, are provided. A coil capture device includes a superelastic coil capable of percutaneously removing plaque and clots from blood vessels without the need for surgical intervention. A radiopaque element is secured over the coil to improve visualization of the coil capture device, which enhances the accuracy of the procedure. A hollow introducing sheath is also provided to facilitate the endoluminally delivery of the coil capture device to the clot region within the patient's vasculature.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 1/00; A61B 17/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/22 (2006.01); A61B 17/00 (2006.01); A61B 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/221 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00867 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00924 (2013.01); A61B 2090/3925 (2016.02)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9825656 A2 19980618; WO 9825656 A3 19981015; EP 0968015 A2 20000105; EP 0968015 A4 20041229

INPADOC legal status

2006-10-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060426

2006-01-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: SYSTEM FOR REMOVING CLOTS FROM FLUID VESSELS

2005-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050601

2004-12-29 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041117

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61B 17/22 B

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61M 1/00 A

2004-08-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEDTRONIC, INC.

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990618

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI NL