Global patent index - EP 0968023 A4

EP 0968023 A4 2000-12-20 - NON RETURN SLIDER VALVE USED IN RESPIRATION SYSTEMS

Title (en)

NON RETURN SLIDER VALVE USED IN RESPIRATION SYSTEMS

Title (de)

RÜCKSCHLAGSPERRVENTIL FÜR BEATMUNGSSYSTEME

Title (fr)

VALVE ANTIRETOUR A COULISSE UTILISEE DANS DES SYSTEMES DE RESPIRATION

Publication

EP 0968023 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97947654 A

Priority

  • AU 9700849 W
  • AU PO422996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9826830A1] The valve (14) comprises a housing (22) and a slider element (24) connected to a mask housing (26). During normal operation side ports (30, 34) are closed by element (24). The air flow to a patient must be sufficient to overcome the slight attractive force between magnets (36, 38). If the flow from the generator drops to below the level necessary to keep the slider element to the open position, the magnets move together allowing plate (39) to stop flow to the patient, who may breath unassisted through the side ports.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 16/20; A62B 9/02; B63C 11/14; F16K 11/044; F16K 27/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 16/06 (2006.01); A61M 16/20 (2006.01); A62B 9/02 (2006.01); A62B 18/10 (2006.01); F16K 11/044 (2006.01); F16K 15/02 (2006.01); F16K 31/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16K 31/084 (2013.01); A61M 16/208 (2013.01); A62B 9/02 (2013.01); A62B 18/10 (2013.01); F16K 15/02 (2013.01); A61M 16/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9826830 A1 19980625; AU PO422996 D0 19970116; EP 0968023 A1 20000105; EP 0968023 A4 20001220; JP 2001506883 A 20010529

INPADOC legal status

2006-03-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050809

2004-08-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RESMED LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040319

2000-12-20 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20001106

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990625

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 19990625;LT PAYMENT 19990625;LV PAYMENT 19990626;RO PAYMENT 19990625;SI PAYMENT 19990625