Global Patent Index - EP 0968027 A4

EP 0968027 A4 2000-03-29 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR ESTABLISHING VASCULAR ACCESS

Title (en)

METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR ESTABLISHING VASCULAR ACCESS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR SCHAFFUNG EINES GEFÄSS-ZUGANGS

Title (fr)

PROCEDES ET SYSTEMES D'ACCES VASCULAIRE

Publication

EP 0968027 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98903547 A

Priority

  • US 9800931 W
  • US 3612497 P
  • US 85664197 A
  • US 94299097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9831272A2] A body lumen access system comprises a distal access cannula and a proximal access cannula. The distal access cannula is attached to or within the body lumen and the proximal access cannula is attached to an implantable port or is transcutaneously positioned and attached to a luer or other external connector. The distal and proximal access cannulas are usually implanted separately, cut to length, and attached at a subcutaneous junction location. Preferably, the proximal access cannula has a larger lumen diameter than that of the distal access cannula in order to reduce flow resistance within the cannula system. In some cases the distal and proximal access cannulas may be formed integrally.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 39/02; A61M 39/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 37/00 (2006.01); A61M 1/36 (2006.01); A61M 39/02 (2006.01); A61M 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61M 39/0208 (2013.01); A61M 1/3653 (2013.01); A61M 1/3659 (2013.01); A61M 25/0023 (2013.01); A61M 2205/195 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9831272 A2 19980723; WO 9831272 A3 19981112; AU 6029498 A 19980807; CA 2278125 A1 19980723; EP 0968027 A2 20000105; EP 0968027 A4 20000329; JP 2001513000 A 20010828

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060712

2004-03-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VASCA, INC.

2004-03-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VASCA, INC.

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030121

2000-03-29 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000211

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61M 39/02 A, 7A 61M 39/10 B

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990823

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE