Global Patent Index - EP 0968049 A1

EP 0968049 A1 2000-01-05 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DISCHARGING A LIQUID-DISSOLVED OR FINELY DISTRIBUTED MEDIUM

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DISCHARGING A LIQUID-DISSOLVED OR FINELY DISTRIBUTED MEDIUM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSTRAGEN EINES IN EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT GELÖSTEN ODER FEIN VERTEILTEN MEDIUMS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'EXTRACTION D'UNE MATIERE DISSOUTE OU FINEMENT DISPERSEE DANS UN LIQUIDE

Publication

EP 0968049 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98907990 A

Priority

  • DE 19711855 A
  • EP 9800409 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19711855A1] The invention relates to a method for discharging a liquid-dissolved or finely distributed medium enabling said substance to be used in a remote place from the point of discharge. A limited amount of liquid is arranged in a tubular housing with one open end. At the other end of the housing, a highly pressurized gaseous blowing agent is applied to the liquid for a short period in order to produce a flying jet of limited length.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 3/04; A62C 13/68; A62C 35/02; B01F 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 31/02 (2006.01); B05B 7/08 (2006.01); B05B 7/12 (2006.01); F04F 5/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 31/02 (2013.01); B05B 7/0892 (2013.01); B05B 7/1281 (2013.01); F04F 5/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9842433A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19711855 A1 19981008; DE 19711855 C2 19990602; DE 19711855 C5 20050224; AT 220947 T 20020815; AU 6616198 A 19981020; EP 0968049 A1 20000105; EP 0968049 B1 20020724; WO 9842433 A1 19981001

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070126

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060125

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *WIEGERS WILFRIED

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070126

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070126

2007-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070126

2007-09-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2006-11-22 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20060716

2006-03-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060314

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060127

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060124

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060124

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-06-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: IFEX IMPULSE FIRE EXTINGUISHING SYSTEM GMBH

- Effective date: 20030424

2003-02-14 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030130

2003-01-06 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-11-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021024

2002-10-24 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021024

2002-08-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804892 20020829

2002-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT

2002-07-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-24 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-07-24 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-07-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 220947 T 20020815

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010516

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990705

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT