Global patent index - EP 0968060 A1

EP 0968060 A1 2000-01-05 - PROCESS FOR GENERATING STRUCTURED SURFACES IN COIL COATING

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR GENERATING STRUCTURED SURFACES IN COIL COATING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR GENERIERUNG STRUKTURIERTER OBERFLÄCHEN BEI DER SPULENBESCHICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR GENERER DES SURFACES STRUCTUREES DANS UNE ENDUCTION EN CONTINU DE BANDES

Publication

EP 0968060 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98906902 A

Priority

  • EP 98906902 A
  • EP 9800541 W
  • EP 97101538 A

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 3/12; B05D 5/02; B44D 2/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 9/14 (2006.01); B05D 3/12 (2006.01); B05D 5/02 (2006.01); B05D 5/06 (2006.01); B05D 7/14 (2006.01); B44D 2/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 3/12 (2013.01); B05D 5/061 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9833601A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

AT 238108 T 20030515; DE 69813786 T2 20040129; EP 0968060 A1 20000105; EP 0968060 B1 20030423

INPADOC legal status

2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-09-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040202

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040126

2004-02-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040202

2003-12-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-07-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69813786

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-05-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2003-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-04-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-04-23 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-04-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-04-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010807

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990713

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE