Global patent index - EP 0968064 A1

EP 0968064 A1 2000-01-05 - METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR LOW PRESSURE DIE CASTING IN A MOULD WITH CERAMIC CASTING DIE

Title (en)

METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR LOW PRESSURE DIE CASTING IN A MOULD WITH CERAMIC CASTING DIE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND NIEDERDRUCKGIESSANLAGE MIT KERAMISCHER KOKILLE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION DE COULEE SOUS BASSE PRESSION DANS UN MOULE A COQUILLE CERAMIQUE

Publication

EP 0968064 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98964545 A

Priority

  • FR 9802908 W
  • FR 9800091 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2773337A1] In a case (1) is arranged a ceramic casting die (21) defining a casting zone (22), surrounded by a sand mass (23) without binder. The casting zone is connected to a metal liquid source (4) below wherein are successively applied a pressure (P1) bringing the metal to the threshold of the casting zone (22), a pressure (P2) slightly higher than what is required to fill said zone, then an outright excess pressure (P3); finally the pressure is brought back to the first value (P1). When the casting zone is filled, the space containing the sand mass (23) is depressurized to prevent deformation of the casting die (21) caused by the excess pressure (P3), at least until a metal crust is formed on the casting die, and at most until the excess pressure start to decrease in the liquid metal source (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 18/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 18/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 18/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9934945A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2773337 A1 19990709; FR 2773337 B1 20000211; CA 2282673 A1 19990715; DE 69808892 D1 20021128; DE 69808892 T2 20030220; EP 0968064 A1 20000105; EP 0968064 B1 20021023; ES 2186248 T3 20030501; US 6422293 B1 20020723; WO 9934945 A1 19990715

INPADOC legal status

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111230

2013-07-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130704

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111229

2012-10-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69808892

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111229

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20101223

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101209

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101123

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101222

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-08-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-12-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051229

2005-12-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051229

2004-11-19 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20041119

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-11-19 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20041119

- Year of fee payment: 07

2003-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2186248

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-03-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030221

2002-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69808892

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20021128

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT SE

2002-10-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAINT-GOBAIN SEVA

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020131

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990820

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT SE