Global Patent Index - EP 0968111 A2

EP 0968111 A2 2000-01-05 - RAIL VEHICLE, ESPECIALLY A LOW-PLATFORM URBAN RAILWAY WAGON

Title (en)

RAIL VEHICLE, ESPECIALLY A LOW-PLATFORM URBAN RAILWAY WAGON

Title (de)

SCHIENENFAHRZEUG, INSBESONDERE NIEDERFLUR-STADTBAHNWAGEN

Title (fr)

VEHICULE SUR RAILS, EN PARTICULIER WAGON A PLATE-FORME SURBAISSEE DE CHEMIN DE FER URBAIN

Publication

EP 0968111 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98919057 A

Priority

  • DE 9800680 W
  • DE 19711036 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19711036A1] The invention relates to a railway wagon, especially a low-platform urban railway wagon, comprising a driven short vehicle part (1) and a non-driven vehicle part (2) provided with a driver compartment (3), said driven and non-driven vehicle parts being connected flexibly to one another. These vehicle parts (1 and 2) contain a dropped floor (4) which is lowered towards the rails (12). The non-driven vehicle part (2) has a raised floor (5) which is limited to the driver compartment area. A carrying bogie (7) with wheels (7a), said wheels having a small diameter and being arranged at short intervals from each other, is located beneath the driver compartment (3) of the vehicle part (2) which in addition to said driver compartment (3) also has a longer passenger area (6). The dropped floor (4) which extends as far as the rear wall (3a) of the driver compartment (3) can be reached via a double-winged entrance door (9) located in the vehicle side wall (8), directly next to the rear wall (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 13/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9841433A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19711036 A1 19980924; AT 203966 T 20010815; EP 0968111 A2 20000105; EP 0968111 B1 20010808; ES 2161528 T3 20011201; WO 9841433 A2 19980924; WO 9841433 A3 19981105

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170602

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170207

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170316

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-03-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2004-05-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-03-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS AG

- Free text: SIEMENS DUEWAG SCHIENENFAHRZEUGE GMBH#DUISBURGER STRASSE 145#47829 KREFELD (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SIEMENS AG#WITTELSBACHERPLATZ 2#80333 MUENCHEN (DE)

2002-07-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2161528 T3

2001-11-08 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011108

2001-11-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011108

2001-09-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801171 20010913

2001-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-08-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 203966 T 20010815

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010123

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990702

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI NL PT SE