Global Patent Index - EP 0968119 A1

EP 0968119 A1 2000-01-05 - FOLDING BOX WITH ANGULAR BELLOWS

Title (en)

FOLDING BOX WITH ANGULAR BELLOWS

Title (de)

FALTSCHACHTEL MIT SCHRÄGBÄLGEN

Title (fr)

BOITE PLIANTE A SOUFFLETS ANGULAIRES

Publication

EP 0968119 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 97931858 A

Priority

  • FR 9701191 W
  • FR 9702117 A
  • FR 9703499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2746767A1] The invention concerns a cardboard container characterised in that it comprises lining panels (501 and 502) of substantially the same surface area as the side walls (109 and 110), designed to be located opposite said side walls (109 and 110) parallel thereto, and integral with the closing panel (140) by one of their edges and either with a wall (107-109-110) adjacent to the base (106), or with a fixing flap (142) integral with the closing panel (140), or with both these elements, via a bellows (503) formed by at least two tabs (504-505-506, 515-516) mutually linked by a folding line.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/36; B65D 5/02; B65D 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/20 (2006.01); B65D 5/24 (2006.01); B65D 5/54 (2006.01); B65D 5/66 (2006.01); B65D 17/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/241 (2013.01); B65D 5/2095 (2013.01); B65D 5/5455 (2013.01); B65D 5/546 (2013.01); B65D 5/6626 (2013.01); B65D 5/6664 (2013.01); B65D 5/6667 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9836979A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2746767 A1 19971003; FR 2746767 B1 19990129; AU 3546197 A 19980909; DE 69731229 D1 20041118; DE 69731229 T2 20051013; EP 0968119 A1 20000105; EP 0968119 B1 20041013; ES 2229372 T3 20050416; US 2002036230 A1 20020328; WO 9836979 A1 19980827

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130329

2013-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110908

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110715

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090128

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070703

2007-04-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20070201

2007-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050704

2006-07-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-07-14 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050714

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050704

2005-07-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050703

2005-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2229372

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-02-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: CHEVALIER, SIMONE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2004-12-01 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CHEVALIER, SIMONE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-12-01 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN2

- Inventor name: CHEVALIER, PIERRE, ANDRE, MARC

2004-12-01 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN2

- Inventor name: CHEVALIER, JAQUES, PAUL

2004-12-01 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN2

- Inventor name: CHEVALIER, PATRICK, ANDRE, MARTIAL

2004-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69731229

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-11-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2004-10-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-06 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19U

- Effective date: 20021220

2003-08-06 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19W

- Effective date: 20030915

2002-08-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: BLANK FOR A FOLDING BOX

2000-06-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000516

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990727

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL