Global Patent Index - EP 0968120 A1

EP 0968120 A1 2000-01-05 - CONTAINER WITH TAMPER EVIDENT CLOSURE

Title (en)

CONTAINER WITH TAMPER EVIDENT CLOSURE

Title (de)

BEHÄLTER MIT ORIGINALITÄTSSICHERUNGSVERSCHLUSS

Title (fr)

RECIPIENT AVEC SYSTEME DE FERMETURE INVIOLABLE

Publication

EP 0968120 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98907046 A

Priority

  • GB 9800583 W
  • GB 9705080 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9840284A1] A container having a hollow body portion (2) closed by a cap portion (6) has a tamper evident closure thereon which comprises at least one plug (12) carried by one of the body portion (2) and the cap portion (6) and which, with the cap portion (6) in a closed position on the body portion (2), is located in, to be a tight friction fit in, a corresponding recess (10) formed in the other of the body portion (2) and the cap portion (6), a region of weakness (18) being provided between the plug (12) and the component on which it is mounted, the arrangement being such that, on movement of the cap portion (6) from its closed position on the body portion (2), said region of weakness (18) is broken whereby, on return of the cap portion (6) to its closed position, evidence of tampering is immediately visually apparent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 55/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 55/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 55/024 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9840284A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB IE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9840284 A1 19980917; AU 6303298 A 19980929; EP 0968120 A1 20000105; EP 0968120 B1 20011121; GB 9705080 D0 19970430

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-31 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2003-10-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2003-02-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030225

2003-02-25 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030225

2002-11-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-02-22 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020222

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-02-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020220

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): GB IE

2001-09-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): GB IE

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010226

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990928

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): GB IE