Global patent index - EP 0968128 A1

EP 0968128 A1 2000-01-05 - DEVICE FOR STACKING SHEETS, IN PARTICULAR SHEET-FED PAPER OR CARDBOARD SHEETS DELIVERED ONTO PALLETS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR STACKING SHEETS, IN PARTICULAR SHEET-FED PAPER OR CARDBOARD SHEETS DELIVERED ONTO PALLETS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM STAPELN VON BÖGEN, INSBESONDERE VON GESCHUPPT ZUGEFÖRDERTEN PAPIER- ODER KARTONBÖGEN AUF PALETTEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'EMPILAGE DE FEUILLES, EN PARTICULIER DE FEUILLES DE PAPIER OU DE CARTON TRANSPORTEES SUR DES PALETTES PAR UN SYSTEME A LAMELLES

Publication

EP 0968128 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98910737 A

Priority

  • DE 19711406 A
  • EP 9801342 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19711406C1] Devices for stacking sheet-fed paper or cardboard sheets (1) on pallets (4) are known to have a vertically stationary conveyor (2) at a height above the maximum stack level above the floor and a storage platform (5) which can be raised and lowered upon which the stacks are formed. An optical sensor (17) which senses the stack level is arranged at the input side prior to the stacking area to control the lowering of the storage platform (5). According to the invention, at least three optical sensors (17) are disposed below the conveyor level at a slight distance from each other in a vertical line. The maximum vertical distance between the two sensors (17) is 20 mm. By activating any two sensors (17), the drop in height of the sheets (1) can be set depending on the type of sheet and without the need for extensive adjustment upon a change in the type of sheet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 31/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/10 (2006.01); B65H 43/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/10 (2013.01); B65H 43/08 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42256 (2013.01); B65H 2511/152 (2013.01); Y10S 414/105 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9841465A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19711406 C1 19981001; EP 0968128 A1 20000105; EP 0968128 B1 20020605; ES 2182286 T3 20030301; US 6318954 B1 20011120; WO 9841465 A1 19980924

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150307

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150307

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-06-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030306

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2182286

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-11-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER JAGENBERG GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2002-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2002-08-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER JAGENBERG GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020721

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59804326

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-11

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020605

2000-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000703

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990810

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL