Global patent index - EP 0968139 A1

EP 0968139 A1 2000-01-05 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A HOLLOW TV PRODUCT OF GLASS

Title (en)

METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A HOLLOW TV PRODUCT OF GLASS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES HOHLEN TV PRODUKTS AUS GLAS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN ELEMENT DE TELEVISION EN VERRE

Publication

EP 0968139 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98951625 A

Priority

  • EP 98951625 A
  • EP 97203697 A
  • IB 9801809 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9926888A1] A method of manufacturing a TV product of glass, such as a TV screen or a TV cone, in which method a blob of a viscous glass is introduced at a high temperature into a mould, whereafter a plunger is pressed with a required pressure into the viscous glass to obtain the desired shape of the product, after which the product is cooled to room temperature. In the manufacture, the plunger remains in contact with the product until the product is dimensionally stable, which is obtained by choosing the ratio between the time period during which the plunger is in contact with the product and the time period during which the product remains in the mould to be greater than 0.5 and smaller than 1.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C03B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C03B 11/00 (2006.01); C03B 11/10 (2006.01); C03B 11/12 (2006.01); C03B 11/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C03B 11/127 (2013.01); C03B 11/10 (2013.01); C03B 11/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9926888A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9926888 A1 19990603; CN 1244180 A 20000209; DE 69821602 D1 20040318; DE 69821602 T2 20040930; EP 0968139 A1 20000105; EP 0968139 B1 20040211; JP 2001509772 A 20010724

INPADOC legal status

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041129

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20051113

2005-11-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051113

2005-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-02-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041112

2005-01-14 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: D6

2004-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041129

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041125

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-03-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69821602

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-03-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-10 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20040213

2004-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020820

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991203

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB