Global patent index - EP 0968229 A1

EP 0968229 A1 2000-01-05 - ANTIGENIC PEPTIDES REACTING WITH ANTI-OVARY ANTIBODIES

Title (en)

ANTIGENIC PEPTIDES REACTING WITH ANTI-OVARY ANTIBODIES

Title (de)

ANTIGENISCHE, GEGEN DIE GEGEN DAS OVARIUM GERICHTETE ANTIKÖRPER REAGIERENDE PEPTIDE

Title (fr)

PEPTIDES ANTIGENIQUES REAGISSANT AVEC LES ANTICORPS ANTI-OVAIRE

Publication

EP 0968229 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 97947825 A

Priority

  • FR 9616385 A
  • IB 9701611 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2757862A1] Disclosed is an oligopeptide consisting in the peptide reference sequence Thr Gln Cys His Cys Gly Lys Cys (SEQ ID NO: 5), or any peptide sequence or functional variant of said reference sequence, antigenic or immunogenic compound comprising such an oligopeptide, and its applications, especially in the detection and/or quantification of anti-ovary antibodies, in a biological sample.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/59; A61K 38/24; G01N 33/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/395 (2006.01); C07K 14/59 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); G01N 33/567 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/18 (2013.01); C07K 14/59 (2013.01); G01N 33/689 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); G01N 2800/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9829450A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2757862 A1 19980703; FR 2757862 B1 19990129; AU 5406098 A 19980731; CA 2276490 A1 19980709; EP 0968229 A1 20000105; US 2003199452 A1 20031023; US 2005260200 A1 20051124; US 6602853 B1 20030805; WO 9829450 A1 19980709

INPADOC legal status

2008-02-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070824

2007-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040507

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990626

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE