Global patent index - EP 0968237 A1

EP 0968237 A1 2000-01-05 - CONDUCTIVE HETEROCYCLIC GRAFT COPOLYMER AND HETEROCYCLIC MACROMER USED THEREIN

Title (en)

CONDUCTIVE HETEROCYCLIC GRAFT COPOLYMER AND HETEROCYCLIC MACROMER USED THEREIN

Title (de)

LEITFÄHIGE HETEROCYCLISCHE PFROPFCOPOLYMERE UND DABEI ANGEWANDTE MACROMERE

Title (fr)

COPOLYMERE GREFFE HETEROCYCLIQUE CONDUCTEUR ET MACROMERE HETEROCYCLIQUE UTILISE DANS LEDIT COPOLYMERE

Publication

EP 0968237 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98912086 A

Priority

  • US 9806028 W
  • US 82172597 A
  • US 82172497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9841550A1] A conductive graft copolymer is provided comprised of a polymerized acrylic or methacrylic acid ester backbone having grafted thereon pendant polymeric sulfur, nitrogen or oxygen-containing heterocyclic moieties. The conductive graft copolymer is particularly useful as a pressure sensitive adhesive. Novel heterocyclic macromers are also provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08F 290/14; C08G 61/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08F 290/14 (2006.01); C08G 61/12 (2006.01); H01B 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08F 290/14 (2013.01); C08G 61/122 (2013.01); H01B 1/128 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9841550A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9841550 A1 19980924; CA 2283456 A1 19980924; EP 0968237 A1 20000105; JP 2001516390 A 20010925; KR 20000076307 A 20001226

INPADOC legal status

2004-03-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030819

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 08F 290/14 A

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 08G 61/12 B

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 09J 9/02 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 08F 290/14 A

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 08G 61/12 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 09J 9/02 B

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020502

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991015

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE