Global patent index - EP 0968249 A1

EP 0968249 A1 2000-01-05 - NOVEL LINEAR METALLOCENE POLYMERS CONTAINING ACETYLENIC AND INORGANIC UNITS AND THERMOSETS AND CERAMICS THEREFROM

Title (en)

NOVEL LINEAR METALLOCENE POLYMERS CONTAINING ACETYLENIC AND INORGANIC UNITS AND THERMOSETS AND CERAMICS THEREFROM

Title (de)

NEUE LINEAR METALLOCENEPOLYMER MIT ACETYLEN UND ORGANISCHEN EINHEITEN UND DAVON DUROPLASTEN UND KERAMISCHE MATERIALEN

Title (fr)

NOUVEAUX POLYMERES LINEAIRES DE METALLOCENES CONTENANT DES MOTIFS ACETYLENIQUES ET INORGANIQUES, ET MATIERES THERMODURCIES ET CERAMIQUES A BASE DE TELS POLYMERES

Publication

EP 0968249 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98910342 A

Priority

  • US 9804855 W
  • US 81868697 A
  • US 81819397 A
  • US 81501397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9841548A1] Thermally stable thermosets are formed from novel linear polymer containing acetylenic units and a random distribution of organotransition metal complexes, siloxane, boron, and/or carborane-siloxane units formed by crosslinking of the linear copolymers through the acetylene units in the polymer backbone. The thermosets can be used as structural components in high temperature and oxidizing environments or as pyrolytic precursors to metal containing ceramics, ceramic films and fibers having enhanced strength and toughness with superior mechanical, optical, electrical and/or magnetic properties.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08L 79/08; C04B 35/524; C08G 77/398

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C04B 35/52 (2006.01); C04B 35/571 (2006.01); C08G 77/398 (2006.01); C08G 77/56 (2006.01); C08G 77/58 (2006.01); C08G 81/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08G 77/56 (2013.01); C04B 35/571 (2013.01); C08G 77/58 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9841548 A1 19980924; CA 2283505 A1 19980924; CA 2283505 C 20080311; EP 0968249 A1 20000105; EP 0968249 A4 20010905; JP 2001514683 A 20010911; JP 4441770 B2 20100331

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090225

2004-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040908

2001-09-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010720

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-05-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOUSER, ERIC, J.

2000-05-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KELLER, TEDDY, M

2000-04-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOUSER, ERIC, J.

2000-04-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KELLER, TEDDY, M

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOUSER, ERIC, J.

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KELLER, TEDDY, M.

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990923

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE