Global patent index - EP 0968263 A1

EP 0968263 A1 2000-01-05 - USE OF A COOLING LUBRICANT EMULSION FOR CHIP-FORMING METALWORKING

Title (en)

USE OF A COOLING LUBRICANT EMULSION FOR CHIP-FORMING METALWORKING

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG EINER KÜHLSCHMIERSTOFFEMULSION ZUR SPANABHEBENDEN METALLBEARBEITUNG

Title (fr)

UTILISATION D'UN REFRIGERANT LUBRIFIANT SOUS FORME D'EMULSION POUR L'USINAGE DE METAUX PAR ENLEVEMENT DES COPEAUX

Publication

EP 0968263 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98905317 A

Priority

  • DE 19703085 A
  • EP 9800277 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19703085A1] The invention relates to a method for the production of a cooling lubricant emulsion mixed with water, used for metal cutting, whereby a) 2-15 parts by weight of a water-miscible concentrate of a coolling lubricant emulsion are mixed with 98-85 parts by weight of water, so as to obtain a mixture comprising 100 parts by weight, and then b) one disperses 1-14 parts by weight of a non water-miscible native-based cutting oil are dispersed, with strong shearing action into mixture a). The cutting oil is preferably chosen from oxidation-stabilized fatty acid glycerides in the form of triesters with three fatty acids with 14-22 C-atoms per fatty acid, and oxidation-stabilized diesters with two fatty acids with 12-22 C-atoms per fatty acid. The invention further concerns a cooling lubricant emulsion that can be produced by this method, and its use for metal cutting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 173/00; C10M 177/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 173/00 (2006.01); C10M 177/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 173/00 (2013.01); C10M 2201/02 (2013.01); C10M 2201/062 (2013.01); C10M 2201/063 (2013.01); C10M 2201/087 (2013.01); C10M 2201/10 (2013.01); C10M 2201/102 (2013.01); C10M 2201/105 (2013.01); C10M 2205/00 (2013.01); C10M 2207/022 (2013.01); C10M 2207/023 (2013.01); C10M 2207/026 (2013.01); C10M 2207/027 (2013.01); C10M 2207/04 (2013.01); C10M 2207/046 (2013.01); C10M 2207/121 (2013.01); C10M 2207/122 (2013.01); C10M 2207/123 (2013.01); C10M 2207/125 (2013.01); C10M 2207/126 (2013.01); C10M 2207/127 (2013.01); C10M 2207/129 (2013.01); C10M 2207/22 (2013.01); C10M 2207/281 (2013.01); C10M 2207/282 (2013.01); C10M 2207/283 (2013.01); C10M 2207/286 (2013.01); C10M 2207/287 (2013.01); C10M 2207/288 (2013.01); C10M 2207/289 (2013.01); C10M 2207/40 (2013.01); C10M 2207/402 (2013.01); C10M 2207/404 (2013.01); C10M 2209/104 (2013.01); C10M 2209/108 (2013.01); C10M 2215/042 (2013.01); C10M 2215/08 (2013.01); C10M 2215/082 (2013.01); C10M 2215/086 (2013.01); C10M 2215/12 (2013.01); C10M 2215/122 (2013.01); C10M 2215/14 (2013.01); C10M 2215/22 (2013.01); C10M 2215/221 (2013.01); C10M 2215/223 (2013.01); C10M 2215/225 (2013.01); C10M 2215/226 (2013.01); C10M 2215/28 (2013.01); C10M 2215/30 (2013.01); C10M 2219/04 (2013.01); C10M 2219/042 (2013.01); C10M 2219/044 (2013.01); C10N 2210/01 (2013.01); C10N 2240/401 (2013.01); C10N 2250/02 (2013.01); C10N 2270/02 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 173/00 + C10M 125/10 + C10M 125/26 + C10M 129/08 + C10M 129/10 + C10M 129/16 + C10M 129/32 + C10M 129/40 + C10M 129/42 + C10M 129/74 + C10M 129/76 + C10M 133/08 + C10M 133/16 + C10M 133/22 + C10M 133/44 + C10M 135/08 + C10M 135/10 + C10M 145/36 + C10M 159/08

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9832818A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19703085 A1 19980730; AT 350437 T 20070115; DE 59813870 D1 20070215; EP 0968263 A1 20000105; EP 0968263 B1 20070103; TR 9901716 T2 19990921; US 6245723 B1 20010612; WO 9832818 A1 19980730

INPADOC legal status

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070103

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070120

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070824

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070103

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-12-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071005

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-09-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-08-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-08-01 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-07-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2007-04-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070414

2007-04-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070403

2007-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59813870

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20070215

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2007-01-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-01-03 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-01-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-01-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10M 173/00 20060101AFI20060628BHEP

2006-08-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10M 177/00 20060101ALI20060628BHEP

2006-06-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: USE OF A COOLING LUBRICANT EMULSION FOR CHIP-FORMING METALWORKING

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021016

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990720

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE