Global patent index - EP 0968298 A2

EP 0968298 A2 2000-01-05 - ADENOVIRUS VECTORS SPECIFIC FOR CELLS EXPRESSING CARCINOEMBRYONIC ANTIGEN AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF

Title (en)

ADENOVIRUS VECTORS SPECIFIC FOR CELLS EXPRESSING CARCINOEMBRYONIC ANTIGEN AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF

Title (de)

ADENOVIRALE VEKTOREN, SPEZIFISCH FÜR ZELLEN, DIE KARZINOEMBRYONISCHES ANTIGEN EXPRIMIEREN, UND METHODEN FÜR IHRE VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

VECTEURS D'ADENOVIRUS SPECIFIQUES DE CELLULES EXPRIMANT L'ANTIGENE CARCINO-EMBRIONNAIRE ET LEURS METHODES D'UTILISATION

Publication

EP 0968298 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98910147 A

Priority

  • US 9804133 W
  • US 3976397 P
  • US 3355698 A

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/86; A61K 47/48; A61K 48/00; C12N 5/10; C12N 11/08; C12Q 1/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 47/48 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 11/08 (2006.01); C12N 15/86 (2006.01); C12Q 1/70 (2006.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0968298 A2 20000105

INPADOC legal status

2006-10-13 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Country Code: HK

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1025598

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2006-08-16 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20060510

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030530

2002-01-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: CELL GENESYS, INC.

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990915

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE