Global Patent Index - EP 0968312 A1

EP 0968312 A1 2000-01-05 - METHOD FOR FEEDING GRANULAR SOLIDS INTO METAL MELTS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR FEEDING GRANULAR SOLIDS INTO METAL MELTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM EINBRINGEN VON KÖRNIGEN FESTSTOFFEN IN METALLSCHMELZEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'APPORT DE MATIERES SOLIDES GRANULEUSES DANS DES MASSES METALLIQUES FONDUES

Publication

EP 0968312 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 97916364 A

Priority

EP 9701329 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9841658A1] The invention relates to a method for feeding solids into metal or steel melts whereby granular solids required during the analysis adjustment are fed in a predetermined quantity into the turbulent regions of the metal melt in a dense flow process by means of a pneumatic conveying device in order to achieve a high output whilst avoiding expensive and complex measures associated with lances and capital-intensive investments for injection devices and lance-moving devices.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21C 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21C 7/0043 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9841658A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9841658 A1 19980924; AT 217354 T 20020515; CA 2283903 A1 19980924; CA 2283903 C 20070102; DE 59707243 D1 20020613; EP 0968312 A1 20000105; EP 0968312 B1 20020508; ES 2174245 T3 20021101

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170427

2017-03-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59707243

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160317

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160317

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160317

2016-10-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160317

2016-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160317

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150318

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150330

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20150323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030211

2003-03-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030317

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2174245 T3

2002-10-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59707243 20020613

2002-06-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020509

2002-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2002-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

2002-05-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 217354 T 20020515

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990914

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL