Global patent index - EP 0968317 A1

EP 0968317 A1 2000-01-05 - METHOD OF FORMING INTERNAL PASSAGES WITHIN ARTICLES AND ARTICLES FORMED BY SAME

Title (en)

METHOD OF FORMING INTERNAL PASSAGES WITHIN ARTICLES AND ARTICLES FORMED BY SAME

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG INNERER HOHLRÄUME IN GEGENSTÄNDEN UND DADURCH GEFORMTE GEGENSTÄNDE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE FORMER DES CANAUX A L'INTERIEUR DE PRODUITS ET PRODUITS FORMES PAR LEDIT PROCEDE

Publication

EP 0968317 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98908856 A

Priority

  • US 9804054 W
  • US 81938197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9841668A1] A method of producing numerous small passages within a turbomachinery component is disclosed. The method comprises providing a turbomachinery component substrate having grooves, filling the grooves with a filler, condensing a vapor onto the surfaces of the substrate and the filler, and removing the filler. The method enables the formation of small passages located close to the component surface without the low yield rate associated with conventional methods of turbomachinery component production. Turbomachinery components having numerous small passages for cooling are also disclosed. Such passages may diminish fluid pressure losses of a cooling medium passing therethrough.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 14/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23P 15/02 (2006.01); C23C 14/00 (2006.01); C23C 14/02 (2006.01); C23C 14/58 (2006.01); F01D 5/18 (2006.01); F02C 7/00 (2006.01); F02C 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/187 (2013.01); C23C 14/0005 (2013.01); Y02T 50/676 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49316 (2013.01); Y10T 29/4932 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49336 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49337 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49348 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49401 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49989 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9841668 A1 19980924; AR 012080 A1 20000927; CA 2284015 A1 19980924; CN 1250487 A 20000412; DE 69808056 D1 20021024; DE 69808056 T2 20030417; EP 0968317 A1 20000105; EP 0968317 B1 20020918; JP H10263936 A 19981006; KR 20000076249 A 20001226; US 5875549 A 19990302

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160311

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160310

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150513

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150311

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150312

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150328

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-05-18 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Owner name: SIEMENS ENERGY, INC.

- Effective date: 20120413

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-12-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69808056

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Owner name: SIEMENS ENERGY, INC., ORLANDO, US

- Free Format Text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS WESTINGHOUSE POWER CORP., ORLANDO, FLA., US

- Effective date: 20111028

2011-12-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69808056

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Owner name: SIEMENS ENERGY, INC., US

- Free Format Text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS WESTINGHOUSE POWER CORP., ORLANDO, US

- Effective date: 20111028

2011-12-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69808056

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BERG, PETER, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20111028

2011-10-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69808056

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PETER BERG, DE

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69808056

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20021024

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2000-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000704

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990917

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT