Global Patent Index - EP 0968322 A1

EP 0968322 A1 2000-01-05 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING MILLING BATHS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING MILLING BATHS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETREIBEN VON FRÄSBÄDERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'EXPLOITATION DE BAINS DE FRAISAGE

Publication

EP 0968322 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98916915 A

Priority

  • DE 19710563 A
  • EP 9801388 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19710563A1] The invention concerns a method of operating a milling bath (10) wherein a metal workpiece to be milled is immersed in a milling bath (10) containing a milling medium, the metal oxidizing owing to a chemical reaction between the metal and milling medium and being transformed into a soluble complex. The resultant mixture is subjected to a separation process which separates the excess milling medium from the complex, the recovered milling medium being used for the further operation of milling baths and the complex being subjected to a preparation process. According to the invention, a mixture of dissolved complexed metallic ions and milling medium is removed from the milling bath at a concentration of dissolved complexed metallic ions which is far below the saturation limit thereof. The separation process is a nanofiltration process in which the milling medium is separated from the mixture according to the principle of reverse osmosis, the residue simultaneously being concentrated with complexed metallic ions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23F 1/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23F 1/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23F 1/46 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9841672A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IE IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19710563 A1 19980917; DE 19710563 C2 20031002; EP 0968322 A1 20000105; EP 0968322 B1 20031210; US 6454958 B1 20020924; WO 9841672 A1 19980924

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-07-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-06-09 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20031210

2004-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-03-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040321

2004-03-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810404 P 20040122

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT NL SE

2003-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-10 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-12-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-12-10 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-12-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-12-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2000-03-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000214

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991006

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT NL SE