Global Patent Index - EP 0968327 A1

EP 0968327 A1 2000-01-05 - AUXILIARY BLOW NOZZLE FOR AN AIR JET WEAVING MACHINE

Title (en)

AUXILIARY BLOW NOZZLE FOR AN AIR JET WEAVING MACHINE

Title (de)

HILFSBLASDÜSE FÜR EINE LUFTDÜSENWEBMASCHINE

Title (fr)

BUSE DE SOUFFLAGE AUXILIAIRE DESTINEE A UN METIER A TISSER A BUSE D'AIR

Publication

EP 0968327 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965080 A

Priority

  • DE 9803412 W
  • DE 19751354 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19751354C1] The invention relates to an auxiliary blow nozzle for air jet weaving machines which permits a symmetric division of the warp, said division protecting the structure of the warp threads, when the blow nozzle is immersed in the warp. To this end, an envelope curve (5) which describes the free end (1b) of the nozzle body (1) and which has a radius (R1) runs at an angle ( alpha ) relative to the longitudinal axis (4a) of the approximately elliptic cross-section of a nozzle body end area (1a). The surfaces (6, 7) originating from the envelope curve (5) slope downward on both sides to the outer periphery (4) in a manner similar to a roof, and said surfaces (6, 7) thus enclose an angle ( beta ). The respective surface (6, 7) having a radius (R2) graduates into the outer periphery (4). A radius (R3) connects radius (R1) of the envelope curve (5) to the outer periphery (4), and each surface (6, 7) constructs an arc-shaped surface section (6a, 7a) which slopes downward at an angle ( gamma ) relative to the outer periphery (4). The graduations of said surface sections into the adjacent surfaces (6, 7) and into the outer periphery (4) are rounded.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/302 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9927171A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19751354 C1 19990617; AT 201728 T 20010615; DE 59800797 D1 20010705; EP 0968327 A1 20000105; EP 0968327 B1 20010530; JP 2000508391 A 20000704; US 6138719 A 20001031; WO 9927171 A1 19990603

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051118

2004-09-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-07-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031118

2004-06-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LINDAUER DORNIER G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031118

2003-02-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030226

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-11-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021127

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-18 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20021018

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021001

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020927

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011118

2001-09-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-08-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010809

2001-08-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-07-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DIPL.-ING. ETH H. R. WERFFELI PATENTANWALT

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800797 20010705

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201728 T 20010615

2000-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001010

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990705

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT