Global patent index - EP 0968328 A1

EP 0968328 A1 2000-01-05 - BLEACHING AND DELIGNIFYING CELLULOSE USING CAROATE/CARO'S ACID AND PRODUCTION OF SAME

Title (en)

BLEACHING AND DELIGNIFYING CELLULOSE USING CAROATE/CARO'S ACID AND PRODUCTION OF SAME

Title (de)

BLEICHEN UND DELIGNIFIZIERUNG VON ZELLSTOFF DURCH CAROATE/CAROSCHE SÄURE UND HERSTELLUNG DERSELBEN

Title (fr)

BLANCHIMENT ET DELIGNIFICATION DE CELLULOSE PAR CAROATES/ACIDE DE CARO ET PRODUCTION DE CES DERNIERS

Publication

EP 0968328 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98912491 A

Priority

  • DE 19711929 A
  • DE 19803001 A
  • EP 9801622 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9842911A1] The invention relates to a method for bleaching and/or delignifying cellulose in which a) a sodium hydroxide solution and a peroxydisulfate solution are first of all produced by electrolysis of a sulphate, b) the peroxydisulphate solution is converted by hydrolysis into a Caro's acid/caroate solution, c) said Caro's acid/caroate solution is left to cool and d) used immediately as a bleaching solution for bleaching and/or delignifying cellulose, the Caro's acid/caroate solution becoming neutralized upon introduction into the bleaching solution.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21C 9/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21C 9/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21C 9/166 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9842911A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9842911 A1 19981001; AT 284994 T 20050115; CA 2284520 A1 19981001; EP 0968328 A1 20000105; EP 0968328 B1 20041215; JP 2001518153 A 20011009; NO 994554 A 19990920; NO 994554 D0 19990920

INPADOC legal status

2006-02-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-12-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050916

2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-07-13 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20041215

2005-03-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050319

2005-03-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050315

2005-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59812386

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20050120

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB SE

2004-12-15 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEGUSSA INITIATORS GMBH & CO. KG

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010518

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990920

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB SE