Global Patent Index - EP 0968334 A1

EP 0968334 A1 2000-01-05 - HYDRAULIC CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A MOBILE WORK MACHINE, ESPECIALLY A WHEEL LOADER

Title (en)

HYDRAULIC CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A MOBILE WORK MACHINE, ESPECIALLY A WHEEL LOADER

Title (de)

HYDRAULISCHE STEUERANORDNUNG FÜR EINE MOBILE ARBEITSMASCHINE, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINEN RADLADER

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE COMMANDE HYDRAULIQUE POUR UNE MACHINE DE TRAVAIL MOBILE, EN PARTICULIER POUR UN CHARGEUR SUR ROUES

Publication

EP 0968334 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98916979 A

Priority

  • DE 19711769 A
  • EP 9801543 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19711769A1] The invention relates to a hydraulic control system for use predominantly for a mobile working machine, especially a wheel loader, comprising at least one hydraulic cylinder (12) which helps to move the working tool, a distribution valve (11) for controlling the pressure channels between the hydraulic cylinder (12), a pressure source and a tank (27), a hydraulic accumulator (21) which can be connected to the pressure source via a filling line (20) and a control valve (50, 60, 75). Said control valve provides the means for controlling the opening and closing of a connection between the hydraulic accumulator (21) and the hydraulic cylinder (12). The aim of a hydraulic control system of this type is to avoid unwanted movements of the hydraulic cylinder. According to the invention, the inventive hydraulic accumulator can only be filled up when the distribution valve is activated in order to achieve this aim.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/43 (2006.01); E02F 9/22 (2006.01); F15B 1/02 (2006.01); F15B 21/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 1/02 (2013.01); E02F 9/2207 (2013.01); E02F 9/2217 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9842923A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19711769 A1 19981001; DE 19711769 C2 19990602; EP 0968334 A1 20000105; EP 0968334 B1 20020612; JP 2001519009 A 20011016; US 6260355 B1 20010717; WO 9842923 A1 19981001

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59804420

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120317

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120317

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120317

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120318

2012-10-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120502

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110329

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110324

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110401

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110325

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030313

2002-12-18 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BOSCH REXROTH AG

2002-12-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020912

2002-07-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804420 20020718

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-06-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010810

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990911

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE