Global patent index - EP 0968335 A1

EP 0968335 A1 2000-01-05 - SANITARY FITTING

Title (en)

SANITARY FITTING

Title (de)

SANITÄRARMATUR

Title (fr)

ROBINETTERIE SANITAIRE

Publication

EP 0968335 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98913693 A

Priority

  • DE 19711188 A
  • DE 19715976 A
  • EP 9801367 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19758291A1] The tap is mounted in a sleeve (14) with flange (15) and inlets (12) on which hot- and cold-water supply hoses are pushed and held by friction. The sleeve fits with its outside diameter (14) in the bore (13) of a connector fixture (7). The connector fixture is attached permanently to e.g. a sink on which it is clamped between a flange (17) and a nut (10). The sleeve is held by friction in the connector fixture. The friction between the outside diameter of the sleeve and the bore of the fixture is larger than the friction between the inlets (12) in the flange (15) and the infeed hoses

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/0402 (2013.01); E03C 1/0401 (2013.01); Y10T 137/6977 (2015.04); Y10T 137/9464 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9841698A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19758291 A1 19981001; DE 19758291 C2 20020314; EP 0968335 A1 20000105; EP 0968335 B1 20030611; ES 2201472 T3 20040316; US 6360774 B1 20020326; WO 9841698 A1 19980924

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070310

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060311

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060310

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 09

2006-03-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060311

2006-03-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060310

2005-05-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050520

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-03-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050323

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-03-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050311

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050228

- Year of fee payment: 08

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2201472

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-11-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59808698

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20030717

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: IDEAL-STANDARD GMBH & CO. OHG

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011120

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990914

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT