Global patent index - EP 0968338 A1

EP 0968338 A1 2000-01-05 - DEVICE FOR SEALING OFF CONCRETE BASES FROM RISING DAMP

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR SEALING OFF CONCRETE BASES FROM RISING DAMP

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABDICHTUNG VON BETONSOHLEN GEGEN AUFSTEIGENDE FEUCHTIGKEIT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF SERVANT A ETANCHEIFIER DES SOLS EN BETON POUR EMPECHER LA MONTEE D'HUMIDITE

Publication

EP 0968338 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98917004 A

Priority

  • DE 29704997 U
  • EP 9801591 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9841704A1] The invention relates to a device for sealing off a concrete base (1) provided with a bituminous coating (2) from rising damp underneath cast asphalt. In order to create a device of said type, which is both easy to produce and install, and provides faultless, permanent damp-proofing of sealing strips and cast asphalt on concrete bases, the inventive device comprises a drainage strip (3) which can be applied to the bituminous coating (2) of the concrete base (1) and a polymer bituminous soldered strip (6) arranged thereon and furnished with a raised support (7). A so-called rail strip made of polymer bitumen is preferably used as a drainage strip (3). The polymer bituminous soldered strip (6) is soldered on the entire surface of the drainage strip (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/66; E01D 19/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01D 19/08 (2006.01); E04B 1/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01D 19/083 (2013.01); E04B 1/66 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9841704A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB IT LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29704997 U1 19980716; AT 207996 T 20011115; EP 0968338 A1 20000105; EP 0968338 B1 20011031; WO 9841704 A1 19980924

INPADOC legal status

2002-10-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KOHL G.M.B.H. & CIE DACHBELAG- UND BAUTENSCHUTZMI

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-05-01 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011031

2002-04-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2002-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020318

2002-03-18 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020318

2001-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59801961

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20011206

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT LU NL

2001-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 207996

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20011115

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2001-04-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: DEVICE FOR SEALING OFF CONCRETE BASES PROVIDED WITH A LAYER OF BITUMEN

2000-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991002

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT LU NL