Global patent index - EP 0968342 A1

EP 0968342 A1 2000-01-05 - SCAFFOLDING WITH VERTICAL AND DIAGONAL POLES

Title (en)

SCAFFOLDING WITH VERTICAL AND DIAGONAL POLES

Title (de)

GERÜST MIT VERTIKAL- UND DIAGONALSTÜTZEN

Title (fr)

ECHAFFAUDAGE A MONTANTS VERTICAUX ET DIAGONAUX

Publication

EP 0968342 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98919114 A

Priority

  • DE 19711496 A
  • EP 9801586 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19711496A1] The invention relates to scaffolding, especially facade scaffolding, comprising vertical poles (11) located one behind the other, preferably in pairs, and interconnected at given vertical intervals by means of cross struts (12). Said vertical poles (11) consist preferably of individual elements (11') and form support frames (43) with said cross struts (12). Base plates (13) are also positioned between the cross struts (12) of neighbouring support frames (43). Diagonal poles (27) are arranged between at least some of the neighbouring vertical poles (11). According to the invention, scaffolding of this type is configured in such a way that at least one end of the diagonal poles (27) engages in an aperture (16) provided in the designated vertical pole (11) by means of a hook (15, 15'). Said opening lies at least essentially in the plane defined by the axes (17) of the neighbouring vertical poles (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 1/16; E04G 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 5/16 (2006.01); E04G 7/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 7/305 (2013.01); E04G 5/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9841713A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19711496 A1 19980924; AT 201734 T 20010615; AU 7208098 A 19981012; EP 0968342 A1 20000105; EP 0968342 B1 20010530; ES 2159948 T3 20011016; PL 196024 B1 20071130; PL 335678 A1 20000508; PT 968342 E 20011130; TR 9902299 T2 20000121; US 6220392 B1 20010424; WO 9841713 A1 19980924

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160316

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160326

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150320

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150326

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150326

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150311

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-03-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59800798

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KOHLER SCHMID MOEBUS PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCH, DE

2014-03-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59800798

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KOHLER SCHMID MOEBUS PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010829

2001-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2159948

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2001-10-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010815

2001-08-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59800798

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20010705

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2001-07-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 201734

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20010615

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000711

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990907

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT PT SE