Global Patent Index - EP 0968345 A1

EP 0968345 A1 2000-01-05 - BASE FOR SECURING SHAPED RODS

Title (en)

BASE FOR SECURING SHAPED RODS

Title (de)

SOCKEL ZUR BEFESTIGUNG VON PROFILSTÄBEN

Title (fr)

SOCLE DE FIXATION DE BATONS PROFILES

Publication

EP 0968345 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965065 A

Priority

  • DE 9803320 W
  • DE 29720482 U
  • DE 19842297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6367762B1] A base (80a) for fastening profiled rods (35, 40, 70) is proposed. The base (80a) is comprised of a sole plate (85a) and two walls (90a, 95a) formed onto the sole plate (85a), which are disposed at an angle to each other and at least partially define at least one flat section (130, 185, 210) on the sole plate (85a). The walls (90a, 95a) can be fastened to at least one profiled rod (35, 40, 70). At least one wall (90a, 95a) has a first wall section (100, 110) and a second wall section (175, 180), wherein the respective wall sections (100, 110, 175, 180) define different sized flat sections (130, 185, 210), which are adapted to different sized profiled rods (35, 40, 70). In this manner, one base (80a) can be used for different sized profiled rods (35, 40, 70).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 12/22; E04F 11/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 17/22 (2006.01); E01F 9/011 (2006.01); E04H 12/22 (2006.01); E04H 17/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 17/163 (2013.01); E01F 9/681 (2016.02); E04H 12/2261 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9927215A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6367762 B1 20020409; EP 0968345 A1 20000105; EP 0968345 B1 20030212; ES 2192804 T3 20031016; JP 2001508513 A 20010626; JP 3946269 B2 20070718; WO 9927215 A1 19990603

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170126

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061112

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061112

2007-07-24 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061113

2005-11-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051123

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-22 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20051122

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-10-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2192804 T3

2003-06-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030519

2003-05-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807191 P 20030320

2003-02-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-02-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2003-02-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020218

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991203

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE