Global Patent Index - EP 0968347 A1

EP 0968347 A1 2000-01-05 - LOCK

Title (en)

LOCK

Title (de)

SCHLOSS

Title (fr)

SERRURE

Publication

EP 0968347 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98909590 A

Priority

  • GB 9800707 W
  • GB 9705067 A
  • GB 9800069 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9840590A1] An automatic mechanical lock, particularly for a vehicle door or doors comprises two body portions, one body portion to be mounted on the door at an edge thereof and the other body portion to be mounted adjacent the door and overlapping the edge of the door, a first of the body portions carrying a hasp (12) to receive a spring-mounted bolt (22), and the second body portion (20) carrying the spring-mounted bolt (22) and having an aperture (25) to receive the hasp (12), the bolt (22) being biased by the spring (23) to a position where it can engage the hasp (12) to lock the door, a key mechanism (32, 32A), which when the key is turned in the lock from a first position to a second position, slides the bolt (22) away from the hasp (12) against the action of the spring (23) whereby the door may be opened, an arm (27) movable to engage a slot (24) in the bolt (22) when the key is returned from the second position to the first position to prevent the bolt (22) re-engaging the hasp (12), whereby the door can still be opened, and an actuator (29) spring-biased (30) to block the passage of the bolt (22) when the hasp (12) is removed on opening the door and to allow the hasp (12) to re-enter the aperture (25) on closing of the door, the actuator (29) releasing the arm from the slot in the bolt when the actuator moves to block to the passage of the bolt, whereby when the door is closed, the hasp (12) moves the actuator (29) from its blocking position and the bolt is sprung through the hasp (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 63/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/20 (2006.01); E05B 63/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/19 (2006.01); E05C 19/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/20 (2013.01); E05B 63/0052 (2013.01); E05B 83/16 (2013.01); E05C 19/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9840590A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IE IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9840590 A1 19980917; AT 231581 T 20030215; AU 6408198 A 19980929; DE 69810908 D1 20030227; EP 0968347 A1 20000105; EP 0968347 B1 20030122

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160310

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160310

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150330

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-08-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100708 AND 20100714

2009-12-23 [REG GB S117] CORRECTION OF ERRORS IN PATENTS AND APPLICATIONS (SECT. 117/PATENTS ACT 1977)

- Free text: CORRECTIONS ALLOWED; REQUEST FOR CORRECTION UNDER SECTION 117 FILED ON 16 SEPTEMBER 2009 ALLOWED ON 18 NOVEMBER 2009

2009-11-25 [REG GB S117] CORRECTION OF ERRORS IN PATENTS AND APPLICATIONS (SECT. 117/PATENTS ACT 1977)

- Free text: REQUEST FILED; REQUEST FOR CORRECTION UNDER SECTION 117 FILED ON 16 SEPTEMBER 2009

2005-03-09 [REG GB 728Y] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION ALLOWED (SECT. 28/1977)

2004-04-07 [REG GB 728V] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION FILED (SECT. 28/1977)

2004-01-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031023

2004-01-14 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-12-12 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-12-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-04-23 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-04-22 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-04-22 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-04-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-03-10 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030310

2003-02-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69810908 P 20030227

2003-02-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IE IT NL PT SE

2003-01-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-01-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-01-22 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-01-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-01-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-01-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-01-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IE IT NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991012

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IE IT NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE