Global patent index - EP 0968348 A2

EP 0968348 A2 2000-01-05 - LATCH ARRANGEMENTS FOR AUTOMOTIVE DOORS OR OTHER CLOSURES

Title (en)

LATCH ARRANGEMENTS FOR AUTOMOTIVE DOORS OR OTHER CLOSURES

Title (de)

VERRIEGELUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGTÜREN ODER ANDERE FLÜGEL

Title (fr)

MONTAGES DE VERROU DESTINES A DES PORTIERES D'AUTOMOBILES OU A D'AUTRES DISPOSITIFS DE FERMETURE

Publication

EP 0968348 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 97949047 A

Priority

  • GB 9703434 W
  • GB 9626098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2320943A] A latch arrangement for releasably retaining a striker 10, comprising a latch bolt 11 shaped to retain the striker at a latching position, and to release the striker at an unlatching position of the latch bolt; a locking mechanism moveable 20 between a locking position, at which it retains the latch bolt at its latching position, and an unlocking position, at which it allows the latch bolt to move to its unlatching position; means for linking the locking mechanism to a latch-opening external manual control such as a door handle; drive means 70 coupled to the locking mechanism and/or the latch bolt for powered actuation thereof to latch or unlatch the locking mechanism and/or to drive the latch bolt to its latching position or to its unlatching position; a rotary clutch 498,1490 coupling the drive means to an electrical drive motor output 60A, and a clutch release mechanism 495 drivingly coupled to the said external manual control such that operation of the latch-opening external manual control isolates the latch bolt and locking mechanism from the drive means. Other details of latch operation, coupling arrangements and control linkages are disclosed particularly in motor vehicle central locking systems.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/19; E05B 47/00; E05B 65/32; E05B 65/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/12 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01); E05B 65/36 (2006.01); E05B 17/22 (2006.01); E05B 53/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/14 (2013.01); E05B 77/26 (2013.01); E05B 77/28 (2013.01); E05B 77/48 (2013.01); E05B 79/20 (2013.01); E05B 81/20 (2013.01); E05B 81/66 (2013.01); E05B 81/68 (2013.01); E05B 83/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9827301A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

GB 2320943 A 19980708; GB 9726341 D0 19980211; AU 7739098 A 19980715; DE 69739518 D1 20090910; EP 0968348 A2 20000105; EP 0968348 B1 20050914; GB 2322409 A 19980826; GB 2322409 B 20010523; GB 9626098 D0 19970205; JP 2009007927 A 20090115; WO 9827301 A2 19980625; WO 9827301 A3 19981008

INPADOC legal status

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091213

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110324

2011-04-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110408

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091212

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091212

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091212

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081210

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081205

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090120

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081224

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051212

2006-11-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES;SEARCHED & EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20060913

2006-09-13 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060913

2006-08-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060615

2006-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2248857

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-10-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69734211

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20051020

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

2005-09-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020801

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990908

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT